EP1315904 - HOT WALL COMBUSTION INSERT FOR A ROTARY VANE PUMPING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mallen Research Limited Partnership Suite 4, 946 Grady Avenue Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Mallen Research Limited Partnership Suite 4, 946 Grady Avenue Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLEN, Brian, D. 769 Madison Avenue Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959428.2 | 02.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US24221 | Priority number, date | US20000631882 | 02.08.2000 Original published format: US 631882 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0210588 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315904 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1315904 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/00, F01C1/344 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F01C1/3443 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | F03B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEISSWANDZÜNDUNGSEINSATZ FÜR EINE FLÜGELZELLENMASCHINE | [2003/23] | English: | HOT WALL COMBUSTION INSERT FOR A ROTARY VANE PUMPING MACHINE | [2003/23] | French: | INSERT DE COMBUSTION A PAROI CHAUDE, DESTINE A UNE POMPE A PALETTES ROTATIVES | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   28.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2008 | BE | 15.10.2008 | CY | 15.10.2008 | DK | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | IT | 15.10.2008 | NL | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
GR | 16.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
IT | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
DK | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
BE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
NL | 15.10.2008 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 15.10.2008 | |
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB394048 (BENDIX AVIAT CORP) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB519659 (ARTHUR JOHN ROWLEDGE) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB1017381 (EICKMANN KARL) [A] 1 * page 6, line 45 - line 85 *; | [X]DE3642359 (RUETHER RAINER [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5329901 (ONISHI SHIGERU [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9857037 (PATS INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6078028 (COOPER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3961483 (WILEY EDWARD ROBIN); | [A]US4870827 (MCFARLIN DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US5100308 (GEVELHOFF FRIEDHELM [DE], et al); | [A]US5979395 (MALLEN BRIAN D [US], et al) |