EP1311482 - NON-IMIDAZOLE ARYLOXYPIPERIDINES AS H3 RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. 920 U.S. Route 202, P.O. Box 300 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Ortho McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 920 U.S. Route 202, P.O. Box 300 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
APODACA, Richard 8248 Station Village Lane 2216 San Diego, CA 92108 / US | 02 /
CARRUTHERS, Nicholas, I. 14370 Silver Heights Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 03 /
DVORAK, Curt, A. 7657 Angeleno Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 04 /
SHAH, Chandravadan, R. 14213 Dalhousie Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 05 /
XIAO, Wei 4043 Carmel Springs Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01959582.6 | 06.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001US24660 | Priority number, date | US20000223768P | 08.08.2000 Original published format: US 223768 P | US20010922619 | 06.08.2001 Original published format: US 922619 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0212190 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311482 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311482 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/46, C07D211/44, C07D401/12, A61K31/4465, A61K31/496, A61K31/5355, A61K31/4402, A61P25/00, A61P9/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C07D207/325 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/4465 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07C217/22 (EP,US);
C07C323/25 (EP,US);
C07C335/32 (EP,US);
C07D207/335 (EP,US);
C07D211/22 (EP,US);
C07D211/46 (EP,US);
C07D211/58 (EP,US);
C07D213/36 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D215/06 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/42 (EP,US);
C07D233/54 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D233/88 (EP,US);
C07D235/06 (EP,US);
C07D235/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D257/04 (EP,US);
C07D277/36 (EP,US);
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07D295/096 (EP,US);
C07D295/112 (EP,US);
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
C07D295/205 (EP,US);
C07D307/52 (EP,US);
C07D317/28 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4402, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4465, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICHT-IMIDAZOL ARYLOXYPIPERIDINE ALS H3 REZEPTOR LIGANDEN | [2003/21] | English: | NON-IMIDAZOLE ARYLOXYPIPERIDINES AS H3 RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2003/21] | French: | ARYLOXYPIPERIDINES NON-IMIDAZOLE | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 25.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Request for further processing for: | 25.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.11.2006 | Decision despatched | 12.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.02.2007 | [2009/33] | Cited in | International search | [A]US5182291 (GUBIN JEAN [BE], et al) [A] 1-60 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5352707 (POMPONI SHIRLEY A [US], et al) [AD] 1-60 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0978512 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR]) [AD] 1-60 * the whole document *; | [AD] - IAN D. LINNEY ET AL., "Design, synthesis, and Structure-Activity Relationships of novel Non-imidazole Histamine H3 receptor Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., US, (20000520), vol. 43, no. 12, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2362 - 2370, XP001019293 [AD] 1-60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990952j | [AD] - C. ROBIN GANELLIN ET AL., "Synthesis of Potent Non-imidazole Histamine H3-Receptor antagonists", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE., VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, WEINHEIM., DE, (1998), vol. 331, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 395 - 404, XP002123596 [AD] 1-60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4184(199812)331:12<395::AID-ARDP395>3.0.CO;2-7 | [A] - H: STARK ET AL., "General Construction Pattern of Histamine H3-Receptor Antagonists: Change of a paradigm", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (1998), no. 8, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2011 - 2016, XP004137177 [A] 1-60 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00342-4 |