EP1309637 - POLYURETHANES AND GRAFT COPOLYMERS BASED ON POLYURETHANE, AND THEIR USE FOR PRODUCING COATING MATERIALS, ADHESIVES, AND SEALING COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARTE, Stephan Kupfergraben 13 48282 Emsdetten / DE | 02 /
WEGNER, Egon Spuler Strasse 46 48268 Greven / DE | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/20] | 01 /
SCHWARTE, Stephan Kupfergraben 13 48282 Emsdetten / DE | ||
02 /
WEGNER, Egon Martinstr. 8 97209 Veitshöchheim / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/33] |
Former [2003/20] | Fitzner, Uwe, Dr., et al Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01960653.2 | 13.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001EP09327 | Priority number, date | DE2000139262 | 11.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10039262 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0214394 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1309637 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1309637 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/00, C08F290/06, C08G18/63, C08G18/67, C08G18/08, C09D175/14, C09D175/16 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C09J151/08 (EP,US);
C08F271/00 (EP,US);
C08F283/006 (EP,US);
C08F290/067 (EP,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4233 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/675 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3275 (EP,US);
C09D175/04, C08L33/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYURETHANE UND PFROPFMISCHPOLYMERISATE AUF POLYURETHANBASIS SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGSSTOFFEN, KLEBSTOFFEN UND DICHTUNGSMASSEN | [2003/20] | English: | POLYURETHANES AND GRAFT COPOLYMERS BASED ON POLYURETHANE, AND THEIR USE FOR PRODUCING COATING MATERIALS, ADHESIVES, AND SEALING COMPOUNDS | [2003/20] | French: | POLYURETHANE ET POLYMERISATS MIXTES GREFFES A BASE DE POLYURETHANE ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR PRODUIRE DES MATIERES DE RECOUVREMENT, DES ADHESIFS ET DES MATIERES D'ETANCHEITE | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 20.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2005 | FI | 12.10.2005 | GB | 12.10.2005 | IE | 12.10.2005 | IT | 12.10.2005 | NL | 12.10.2005 | TR | 12.10.2005 | DK | 12.01.2006 | GR | 12.01.2006 | SE | 12.01.2006 | PT | 13.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
TR | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
IT | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
GB | 12.10.2005 | ||
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
IE | 12.10.2005 | ||
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
GR | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
DK | 12.01.2006 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
SE | 12.01.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
PT | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 12.10.2005 | |
NL | 12.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 12.10.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0608021 (AKZO NV [NL]) [AD] 1-19 * claims 1,3 *; | [A]WO9514721 (BASF LACKE & FARBEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 9, line 22 - page 9, line 36 * * page 22, line 11 - page 23, line 19 *; | [A]EP0807647 (ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA ELF [US]) [A] 1-19 * page 2, line 25 - page 2, line 38 ** claim 1 *; | [A]WO9854266 (BASF COATINGS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 20; examples 1,2 * * claims 1,2 * |