EP1314078 - AUTOMATIC NETWORK USER IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trivnet Ltd. P.O. Box 18 60990 Shefayim / IL | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILF, Saar 16 Levi Eshkol 69631 Tel Aviv / IL | 02 /
SHAKED, Shvat Shimoni Street 54 92630 Jerusalem / IL | 03 /
TAL, Or Habrosh Street 16 56516 Savyon / IL | 04 /
TARSI, Yuval Tel Hay Street 46 44229 Kfar Saba / IL | [2003/28] |
Former [2003/22] | 01 /
WILF, Saar Habanai Street 26 96264 Jerusalem / IL | ||
02 /
SHAKED, Shvat Shimoni Street 54 92630 Jerusalem / IL | |||
03 /
TAL, Or Habrosh Street 16 56516 Savyon / IL | |||
04 /
TARSI, Yuval Tel Hay Street 46 44229 Kfar Saba / IL | Representative(s) | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co L.L.P. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Tomkinson, Alexandra Bailey Walsh & Co L.L.P., 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | ||
Former [2003/22] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 01961041.9 | 24.07.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001IL00680 | Priority number, date | US20000220513P | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 220513 P | US20000220815P | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 220815 P | US20010772950 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 772950 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0208853 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314078 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314078 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08, H04L29/12, G06Q30/06, G06Q20/12, G06Q20/04, G06Q20/16 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/305 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/16 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04L61/00 (EP,US);
H04L61/35 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L67/53 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
H04L2463/102 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/22] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE NETZWERKBENUTZERIDENTIFIKATION | [2003/22] | English: | AUTOMATIC NETWORK USER IDENTIFICATION | [2003/22] | French: | IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UN UTILISATEUR DE RESEAU | [2012/33] |
Former [2003/22] | IDENTIFICATION AUTOMATIQUE D'UTILISATEUR DE RESEAU | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 27.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2007 | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | IT | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | ES | 24.05.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | IE | 24.07.2013 | LU | 24.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
IT | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
ES | 24.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 13.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9800951 (MORE MAGIC SOFTWARE MMS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-39 * page 3 - page 6 * * page 10 - page 11 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5845267 (RONEN YZHAK [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,17-22,32-37 * column 1, line 62 - column 3, line 12; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 22 - column 8, line 30 * [Y] 12-16,23-27; | [XY]US5845073 (CARLIN RICHARD K [US], et al) [X] 28-30 * column 7, line 45 - line 63 * [Y] 12-16,23-27; | [X]US5864610 (RONEN YZHAK [US]) [X] 1-6,8-11,17-22,32-37 * column 1, line 55 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 15 - line 40 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 17 * * figure 8 *; | [X]US5905736 (RONEN YZHAK [US], et al) [X] 38,39 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 45 - line 65 * * column 5, line 14 - column 9, line 22 * | International search | [A]US5923756 (SHAMBROOM W DAVID [US]); | [A]US6052785 (LIN DAVID DAH-HAUR [US], et al); | [A]US6061650 (MALKIN GARY [US], et al); | [AP]US6219790 (LLOYD BRIAN [US], et al); | [AP]US6256739 (SKOPP PETER [US], et al) | by applicant | US5845267 | US5864610 |