EP1227621 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL ACCOMMODATING APPARATUS AND SCHEDULING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/31] | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL ACCOMMODATION APPARATUS AND SCHEDULING METHOD | ||
[2011/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Jun 6-3-102, Hikari no Oka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | 02 /
ARAMAKI, Takashi 1-35-10-201, Ooka Minami-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 232-00 / JP | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01961151.6 | 29.08.2001 | [2002/31] | WO2001JP07404 | Priority number, date | JP20000261951 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000261951 | [2002/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0219633 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1227621 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1227621 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04W84/18, H04W88/06 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
H04W72/1215 (EP,US);
H04L12/00 (KR);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | H04W72/12 | ||
Former IPC [2002/31] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND PLANUNGSVERFAHREN | [2011/18] | English: | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL ACCOMMODATING APPARATUS AND SCHEDULING METHOD | [2011/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ACCUEIL POUR UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PLANIFICATION | [2011/18] |
Former [2002/31] | ANPASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND PLANUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2002/31] | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL ACCOMMODATION APPARATUS AND SCHEDULING METHOD | ||
Former [2002/31] | INSTALLATION ABRITANT UN TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET METHODE DE PROGRAMMATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2002 | Translation filed | 25.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2002 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5903548 (DELAMATER JEFF [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - column 6, line 3 *; | [PA]WO0145440 (EADS DEFENCE & SECURITY NTWK [FR], et al) [PA] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * | [A] - DENG D-J ET AL, "A PRIORITY SCHEME FOR IEEE 802.11 DCF ACCESS METHOD", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (19990101), vol. E82-B, no. 1, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 96 - 102, XP000927880 [A] 1-14 * page 97, column L, line 41 - page 98, column R, line 5 * | International search | [A]JPH11252114 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH1155318 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH10190717 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH07303105 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH05102969 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |