EP1314327 - OVERLOAD PROTECTION IN PACKET COMMUNICATION NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFF, Per, Magne Skibberhei 42A N-4817 His / NO | 02 /
OLSEN, Per, Arne Andeveien 18 N-4847 Arendal / NO | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/01] | Sjöberg, Mats Hakan, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/22] | Wennerholm, Kristian, et al Ericsson AB, Patent Unit Radio Networks 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 01961566.5 | 31.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001SE01864 | Priority number, date | US20000229323P | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 229323 P | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0219739 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314327 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314327 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H04W28/02 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04L47/29 (EP,US);
H04L47/32 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04W12/03 (EP);
H04W28/10 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W12/069 (EP);
H04W28/06 (EP,US);
H04W84/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERLASTUNGSSCHUTZ IN PAKETKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZEN | [2003/22] | English: | OVERLOAD PROTECTION IN PACKET COMMUNICATION NETWORKS | [2003/22] | French: | PROTECTION CONTRE LES SURCHARGES DANS DES RESEAUX DE COMMUNICATION A COMMUTATION PAR PAQUETS | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.06.2008 | BE | 18.06.2008 | CY | 18.06.2008 | DK | 18.06.2008 | FI | 18.06.2008 | IT | 18.06.2008 | NL | 18.06.2008 | TR | 18.06.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | IE | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | LU | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | SE | 18.09.2008 | GR | 19.09.2008 | ES | 29.09.2008 | PT | 18.11.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
TR | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
LU | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
CY | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
LU | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
LU | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
IT | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
IE | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
DK | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
BE | 18.06.2008 | ||
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
ES | 29.09.2008 | ||
PT | 18.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
SE | 18.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | ||
NL | 18.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 18.06.2008 | |
FI | 18.06.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5138311 (WEINBERG MORTON [US]) [X] 1-14; | [X]WO9319551 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-14; | [A]US5390299 (REGE SATISH L [US], et al) [A] 1-14; | [A]US6044260 (EATON ERIC THOMAS [US], et al)[A] 1-14 |