EP1315510 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE REPAIR AND/OR REGENERATION OF DAMAGED MYOCARDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | ||
For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as represented by the SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852 / US | |||
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states NEW YORK MEDICAL COLLEGE Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | ||
For all designated states The United States of America, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer, National Institute of Health, 6011 Executive Boulevard Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANVERSA, Piero 229 East 79th Street, Apartment 14D New York, NY 10021 / US | 02 /
ORLIC, Donald 5517 Spruce Tree Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01961855.2 | 31.07.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001US24223 | Priority number, date | US20000221902P | 31.07.2000 Original published format: US 221902 P | US20000258564P | 29.12.2000 Original published format: US 258564 P | US20010258805P | 02.01.2001 Original published format: US 258805 P | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0213760 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315510 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61P9/10 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C12N5/0647 (EP);
A61K35/28 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K2035/124 (EP);
C12N2501/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/23] | A61K35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR REPARATUR UND/ODER REGENERATION DES BESCHÄDIGTEN HERZMUSKELS | [2003/23] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE REPAIR AND/OR REGENERATION OF DAMAGED MYOCARDIUM | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT LA REPARATION ET/OU LA REGENERATION DE MYOCARDE ENDOMMAGE | [2003/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9818486 (ICOGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 *claims*; page 21, line 12 - page 22, line 10 *; | [A]WO0006701 (GENZYME CORP [US]) [A] 1-17*claims* *examples*; | [A] - TOMITA S ET AL, "AUTOTRANSPLANTED MESENCHYMAL STEM CELLS IMPROVE FUNCTION AFTER A MYOCARDIAL INFARCTION", CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS, TX, US, (19981027), vol. 98, no. 17, SUPPL, ISSN 0009-7322, pages I - 200, XP009032355 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - TOMITA S ET AL, "AUTOLOGOUS TRANSPLANTATION OF BONE MARROW CELLS IMPROVES DAMAGED HEART FUNCTION", CIRCULATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, DALLAS, TX, US, (19991109), vol. 110, no. SUPPL 19, ISSN 0009-7322, pages II - 247, XP000869909 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | International search | [XP] - ORLIC ET AL., "Transplanted hematopoietic stem cells repair myocardial infarcts", BLOOD, (20001116), vol. 96, no. 11, page 221A, ABSTRAT NO. 943, XP002907062 | [X] - YAHATA ET AL., "Reconstitution of immune systems in RAG2 -/- mice by transfer with interleukin-12-induced splenic hematopoietic progenitor cells", IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, (1998), vol. 62, no. 3, pages 165 - 170, XP002907060 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-2478(98)00044-3 | [X] - BOLANTE-CERVANTES ET AL., "Pattern of localization of primitive hematopoietic cells in vivo using a novel mouse model", EXPERIMENTAL HEMATOLOGY, (199908), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1346 - 1352, XP002907061 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0301-472X(99)00064-8 |