EP1317366 - RAIL MOUNTED TRAVERSING TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Incline Access, LLC 4601 Stillman Boulevard Tuscaloosa, AL / US | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINGES, Marcus, C. 1444 Blenheim Place Birmingham, AL 35213 / US | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01962270.3 | 21.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001US26048 | Priority number, date | US20000659619 | 11.09.2000 Original published format: US 659619 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222422 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317366 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61B7/06 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B61B13/06 (EP,US);
B61B7/06 (EP,US);
B66B9/0838 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENGEBUNDENES TRANSPORTSYSTEM | [2003/24] | English: | RAIL MOUNTED TRAVERSING TRANSPORT | [2003/24] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT SUR RAIL | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2507887 (CHENEY WALLACE E) [X] 1 * column 1, line 42 - column 4, line 66; figures 1-3; claims 8,9 *; | [X]US5533594 (TREMBLAY JULES M [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 10 * * column 6, line 14 - line 53; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]WO9220604 (GRORUD BISON BEDE LIMITED [GB]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 23 - page 9, paragraph 3; figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]US5572930 (HEIN WILFRIED [DE]); | [X]US3533357 (BRANDON J L); | [X]US4278165 (NIELSEN JACOB A, et al); | [Y]US4627517 (BOR JAN H [NL]); | [X]US3891062 (GENESTE GEORGES); | [A]US2528265 (CRETORS CHARLES J); | [A]US1101910 (ELMQVIST KARL OSCAR [SE]); | [A]US3176628 (REID JAMES F) | by applicant | US3168937 | US5964159 | US5572930 | US3935822 | US5069141 | US4602567 | US3774548 | US4821845 | US5398617 |