EP1194324 - STACKABLE SHOPPING TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH Postfach 1129 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THALHOFER, Armin Russbaumweg 5 89312 Günzburg / DE | 02 /
RIESENEGGER, Markus Grottenau 2 89347 Bubesheim / DE | 03 /
MAATZ, Bernhard Friedrich-List-Strasse 3 86153 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
GLOGGER, Carsten Edelstetter Weg 14 86381 Krumbach / DE | 05 /
WANZL, Gottfried Johann-Göckelmannstr. 3 89340 Leipheim / DE | [2002/15] | Application number, filing date | 01962554.0 | 11.07.2001 | [2002/15] | WO2001DE02607 | Priority number, date | DE2000134331 | 14.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10034331 | DE2001102118 | 18.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10102118 | [2002/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0206107 | Date: | 24.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1194324 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1194324 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/14 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
B62B3/02 (EP,US);
B62B3/1496 (EP,US);
B62B2501/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | STAPELBARER EINKAUFSWAGEN | [2002/15] | English: | STACKABLE SHOPPING TROLLEY | [2002/15] | French: | CADDIE SUPERPOSABLE | [2002/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 09.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4097056 (CASTELLANO PAUL EUGENE) [AD] 2,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2470720 (REUNIS SA ATELIERS [FR]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5203579 (LIPSCHITZ SARAH [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]GB2316368 (CLARES MERCH HAND EQUIP LTD [GB]) [A] * the whole document * |