EP1307359 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE FITTING OF A CHILD'S SEAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/05] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAS, Lothar Am Faberswald 8 90574 Rosstal / DE | 02 /
HIRT, Adam Pelzetleite 27 90614 Ammerdorf / DE | [2003/19] | Application number, filing date | 01962564.9 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/19] | WO2001DE02703 | Priority number, date | DE2000136933 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10036933 | [2003/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0209981 | Date: | 07.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1307359 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1307359 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/01 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B60R21/01556 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/268 (EP);
B60N2/28 (US);
B60N2/286 (EP,US);
B60N2/2863 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/20] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR DETEKTION DER INSTALLATION EINES KINDERSITZES | [2003/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE FITTING OF A CHILD'S SEAT | [2003/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETECTER SI UN SIEGE POUR ENFANT EST INSTALLE | [2003/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 21.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.02.2006 | GB | 01.02.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/11] | GB | 01.02.2006 | |
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SE | 01.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0650869 (TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS [US]); | [A]US5515933 (MEYER MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [YA]WO9626527 (DEFA AS [NO], et al); | [XY]US5690356 (LANE JR WENDELL [US]); | [XAY]DE19827057 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |