Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003535765 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 | EP0106183 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1292462 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2008 | B1 | EP1292462 | 19.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 | EP0106183 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50114545D1 | 15.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 | EP0106183 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6805216 | 19.10.2004 | B2 | US2003173127 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 | EP0106183 | 31.05.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0198101 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10030258 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10030258 | 20.06.2000 |