EP1292462 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE DISTANCE OF A FIRST VEHICLE IN RELATION TO A PRECEDING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NÖCKER, Gerhard Wangener Strasse 47 73033 Göppingen / DE | [2003/12] | Application number, filing date | 01962694.4 | 31.05.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001EP06183 | Priority number, date | DE2000130258 | 20.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10030258 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0198101 | Date: | 27.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292462 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292462 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/16, // G01S13/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B60W30/16 (EP,US);
B60K31/0008 (EP,US);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
B60W2554/00 (EP,US);
B60W2554/4041 (US);
B60W2554/802 (US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
G01S13/726 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/12] | B60K31/00, G05D1/02, G01S13/93, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSTANDSREGELUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS ZU EINEM VORAUSFAHRENDEN FREMDFAHRZEUG UND ABSTANDSREGELSYSTEM | [2003/12] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING THE DISTANCE OF A FIRST VEHICLE IN RELATION TO A PRECEDING VEHICLE | [2003/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME POUR REGULER LA DISTANCE ENTRE UN VEHICULE DE REFERENCE ET UN VEHICULE ROULANT DEVANT CE DERNIER | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 04.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.12.2008 | ES | 14.03.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09315180 ; | [XA]EP0605104 (JAGUAR CARS [GB]) [X] 1,16 * claim 1 * [A] 2-15,17,18; | [XYA]EP0716949 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1,7-9,16 * claim - * [Y] 14,17 [A] 2-6,10-13,15,18; | [X]US5629851 (WILLIAMS MALCOLM [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,16 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]DE19638511 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 14,17 * claim 1 *; | [PX]WO0036435 (RENAULT [FR]) [PX] 1,7,16 * page 3, paragraph L; claim 7 ** page 9, paragraph L; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 04, & JP09315180 A 19971209 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,4,16 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4209047 |