EP1292635 - METHOD FOR PROTECTING A TYRE AGAINST OZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states MICHELIN RECHERCHE ET TECHNIQUE S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | |||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Sociéte de Technologie Michelin 23 rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 09 / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTIN, Alain 15, rue du Temple, Bâtiment B F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
PEYRON, Georges 38, rue des Charmettes F-63200 Riom / FR | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Le Cam, Véronique Marie Christine M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI, F35, Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand-Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01962708.2 | 05.06.2001 | [2003/12] | WO2001EP06356 | Priority number, date | FR20000007313 | 07.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0007313 | [2003/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0194453 | Date: | 13.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292635 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292635 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, B60C13/00, C09D175/04 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/04 (KR);
B60C1/00 (KR);
B60C1/0025 (EP,KR,US);
B60C11/1346 (EP,US);
B60C13/002 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08K5/3477 (KR);
C08J2321/00 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHÜTZEN EINES REIFEN GEGEN OZON | [2003/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PROTECTING A TYRE AGAINST OZONE | [2003/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PROTECTION D'UN PNEUMATIQUE VIS A VIS DE L'OZONE | [2003/12] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 13.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2006 | CY | 11.01.2006 | FI | 11.01.2006 | IE | 11.01.2006 | IT | 11.01.2006 | NL | 11.01.2006 | TR | 11.01.2006 | DK | 11.04.2006 | SE | 11.04.2006 | GR | 12.04.2006 | ES | 22.04.2006 | LU | 05.06.2006 | PT | 12.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | CH | 30.06.2006 | LI | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
TR | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
LU | 05.06.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
GR | 12.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
IT | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
DK | 11.04.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
IE | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
PT | 12.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
NL | 11.01.2006 | ||
SE | 11.04.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 11.01.2006 | |
FI | 11.01.2006 | ||
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 11.01.2006 | |
ES | 22.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 22.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR2183983 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,5-12 * claims 2,7-13 * [A] 13,17-24; | [YA]US3813257 (WEST J) [Y] 1,5-12 * claims 1,5 * * column 3, line 14 - line 53 * * column 5, line 17 - line 49 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 13; | [YA]CA1057640 (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO) [Y] 1,5,6,10-12 * claims 1-8 * * example 5 * [A] 13; | [DA]EP0728810 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [DA] 1,13* claims 1,17 * |