EP1305470 - A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TEXTILE MATERIALS AGAINST FUNGI AND DUST MITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | [2006/34] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAO, Jianwen 50 Boxwood Lane New Milford, CT 06776 / US | [2003/26] |
Former [2003/18] | 01 /
MAO, Jianwen Ruschbachstrasse 29 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01962877.5 | 26.07.2001 | [2003/18] | WO2001EP08662 | Priority number, date | EP20000810702 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00810702 | [2003/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0212616 | Date: | 14.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1305470 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/425, D06M23/04, D06L1/04, D01F11/06 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP,US);
D06M13/425 (EP,KR,US);
A01N47/22 (EP,US);
C11D3/349 (EP,US);
C11D3/48 (EP,US);
D01F11/06 (EP,US);
D06L1/04 (EP,US);
D06M16/00 (EP,US);
D06M23/02 (EP,US);
D06M23/04 (EP,US);
D06M23/06 (EP,US);
D06M23/10 (EP,US);
C11D2111/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEXTILMATERIALEN GEGEN PILZE UND STAUBMILBEN | [2003/18] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE TREATMENT OF TEXTILE MATERIALS AGAINST FUNGI AND DUST MITES | [2003/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MATERIAUX TEXTILES CONTRE LES CHAMPIGNONS ET LES ACARIENS DETRITICOLES | [2003/18] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3625644 (NOSLER HEINZ GUNTER, et al) [A] 10* abstract *; | [X]DE2338633 (SCHNEIDER PETER DR MED) [X] 1,3-7,11-13,15,16 * page 3, line 9 - line 15 * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [Y]EP0488294 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [Y] 14-16 * page 5, line 45 - line 58 *; | [Y]US5746959 (COX ROLAND [GB], et al) [Y] 14-16 * abstract *; | [Y]WO9836111 (COURTAULDS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 14-16 * page 3, line 1 - line 22 * * example 2 *; | [X]EP0937812 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-9,11-13,15,16 * page 5, line 57 - page 9, line 18 * * claims 1,13,22,23 * | Examination | WO9921421 |