EP1325483 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING TRAFFIC JAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiefer, Zoltan Anton Hegelstrasse 43 55122 Mainz / DE | For all designated states Luderschmidt, Wolfgang Jungferngartenstrasse 1 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Kiefer, Zoltan Anton Hegelstrasse 43 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Kiefer, Zoltan Anton Eichendorffstrasse 65 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiefer, Zoltan Anton Hegelstrasse 43 55122 Mainz / DE | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
Kiefer, Zoltan Anton Eichendorffstrasse 65 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2003/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01962923.7 | 08.08.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001EP09190 | Priority number, date | DE2000147736 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047736 | [2003/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0227691 | Date: | 04.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325483 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325483 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1325483 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G08G1/0104 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/28] | G08G1/127, G01C21/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STAUERFASSUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STAUERFASSUNG | [2003/28] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING TRAFFIC JAMS | [2003/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'EMBOUTEILLAGE | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.2003 | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.08.2008 | DK | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | IE | 20.08.2008 | IT | 20.08.2008 | NL | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | SE | 20.11.2008 | GR | 21.11.2008 | ES | 01.12.2008 | PT | 20.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
GR | 21.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
SE | 20.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
IT | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IE | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 20.08.2008 | |
NL | 20.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 20.08.2008 | |
ES | 01.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5204536 (VARDI SHLOMO [IL]) [Y] 10,19 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 15-70 * * column 3, lines 10-65 * * column 4, lines 40-50 *; | [Y]US5311197 (SORDEN JAMES L [US], et al) [Y] 9,13 * figures 1-4 * * column 1, lines 10-65 * * column 3, lines 15-30 * * column 4, lines 30-35 * * column 5, lines 15-50 * * column 6, lines 10-65 * * column 7, lines 5-30 *; | [Y]GB2288892 (OAKRANGE ENGINEERING LTD [GB]) [Y] 6-8,10 * figures 1-19 * * page 3, lines 15-35 * * page 13, lines 1-35 * * page 14, lines 1-35 *; | [XA]DE19643454 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,14,18,21 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 1-65 * * column 2, lines 20-60 * * column 3, lines 1-65 *[A] 22; | [XY]WO9924952 (SWISSCOM [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,5,11,14,18,21 * figures 1-4 * * page 1, lines 5-25 * * page 2, lines 1-30 * * page 3, lines 5-30 * * page 5, lines 15-30 * * page 7, lines 5-25 * * page 8, lines 25-35 * * page 9, lines 5-35 * * page 10, lines 1-20 * [Y] 6-10,13,19 |