Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8416701 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0020551 | 22.08.2000 | GB0103775 | 22.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1320405 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0020551 | 22.08.2000 | GB0103775 | 22.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2383533 | 03.03.2004 | B | GB2383533 | 02.07.2003 | A | GB0306499D0 | 23.04.2003 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0020551 | 22.08.2000 | GB0103775 | 22.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0215981 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0020551 | 22.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0020551D0 | 11.10.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0020551 | 22.08.2000 |