EP1320405 - SPRINKLER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Birkett, David 77 Fernview Drive, Holcombe Brook, Bury Lancashire BL0 9XG / GB | For all designated states Butler, William Anthony 21 Homcliffe Close, Rawtenstall Lancashire BB4 6EE / GB | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | Wilson Gunn M'Caw 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01963133.2 | 22.08.2001 | [2003/26] | WO2001GB03775 | Priority number, date | GB20000020551 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: GB 0020551 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0215981 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1320405 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A62C35/60, A62C37/10 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
A62C37/14 (EP);
A62C35/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRINKLERANLAGE | [2003/26] | English: | SPRINKLER SYSTEM | [2003/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE CREPINE D'INCENDIE | [2003/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2005 | 31.08.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4976320 (POLAN GEORGE S) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR602030 (PAUL-EMILE POUDEROUX) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0505672 (GRINNELL CORP) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]FR791736 (SUET PIERRE) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |