EP1319408 - REMEDIES FOR HEART FAILURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/26] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 9-11 Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8541 / JP | ||
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Daiichi Asubio Pharma Co., Ltd. 9-11, Akasaka 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8541 / JP | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Daiichi Suntory Pharma Co., Ltd. 7-2, Kojimachi 5-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states Daiichi Suntory Biomedical Research Limited 1-1-1, Wakayamadai, shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-8503 / JP | ||
For all designated states Daiichi Suntory Pharma Co., Ltd. 5-7-2, Kojimachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASHIMA, Kayoko 6-11-1-113, Makami-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-1121 / JP | 02 /
KATSURAGI, Naruto 2-30-3-410, Mishimaoka Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0021 / JP | 03 /
SUGIMURA, Keijiro 3-11-24-301, Kasuga Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0031 / JP | 04 /
FURUYA, Mayumi 4-2-3, Yamazaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618-0001 / JP | 05 /
MORISHITA, Ryuichi 2-11-22-502, Miyahara, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0003 / JP | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01963519.2 | 07.09.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001JP07787 | Priority number, date | JP20000273644 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000273644 | [2003/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0220055 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319408 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319408 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/00, A61K31/7088, A61K31/7125, A61P9/02, C12N15/12, C12N5/16, C12Q1/68, A01K67/027, C12N15/11 | [2010/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (KR);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/25] | A61K45/00, A61K31/7076, A61K31/711, A61P9/02, C12N15/12, C12N5/16, C12Q1/68, A01K67/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTEL FÜR HERZVERSAGEN | [2003/25] | English: | REMEDIES FOR HEART FAILURE | [2003/25] | French: | MÉDICAMENTS CONTRE LES D FAILLANCES CARDIAQUES | [2010/04] |
Former [2003/25] | M DICAMENTS CONTRE LES D FAILLANCES CARDIAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | Translation filed | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 21.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.11.2009 | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.2010 | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | DK | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | NL | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 07.09.2010 | LU | 07.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | PT | 29.11.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
LU | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
DK | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
BE | 28.07.2010 | ||
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
NL | 28.07.2010 | ||
PT | 29.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 28.07.2010 | |
NL | 28.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | WO02052006 [ ] (GENOX RESEARCH INC [JP], et al); | [E]WO02060317 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al); | [E]EP1347051 (GENOX RESEARCH INC [JP]); | International search | [Y]US5756664 (AMANN EGON [JP], et al); | [X]WO0035473 (SCIOS INC [US], et al); |