EP1405012 - PORTABLE BARBECUE GRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.C. Bradley Co. 1017 Front Avenue Columbus, GA 31901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states W.C. Bradley Company 1017 Front Avenue Columbus, GA 31904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLEMAN, Brian 6643 Woodberry Road Columbus, GA 31904 / US | 02 /
MCNAIR, John 170 Olinda-Monbulk Rd. Olinda, Victoria Australia 3788 / US | 03 /
MORGAN, Bruce W.C. Bradley Company 1017 Front Avenue Columbus, GA 31904 / US | 04 /
SHARPELS, Harry W.C. Bradley Company 1017 Front Avenue Columbus, GA 31904 / US | 05 /
FUNG, C.K. W.C. Bradley Company 1017 Front Avenue Columbus, GA 31904 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01963908.7 | 10.08.2001 | [2004/15] | WO2001US25163 | Priority number, date | US20000224821P | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 224821 P | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0213663 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405012 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.12.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/07 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
A47J37/0682 (EP,US);
A47J37/0704 (EP,US);
A47J37/074 (EP,US);
A47J37/0763 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | F24B3/00, F24C3/00, A47J37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRAGBARES GRILLGERÄT | [2004/15] | English: | PORTABLE BARBECUE GRILL | [2004/15] | French: | GRIL DE BARBECUE PORTABLE | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2002 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/37] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5553601 (PARKER NICHOLAS S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,16,17 * column 4, line 45 - column 6, line 4; figures 1-5,10 * [Y] 9-11,13-15; | [Y]US541534 (CHARLES HAFFCKE) [Y] 9-11 * page 1, lines 86-104; figures 2,6 *; | [Y]US5873355 (SCHLOSSER ERICH J [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * column 4, lines 6-33; figure 1 *; | [A]US3791368 (HUNT W) [A] 5 * figures 3,9 * | International search | [X]US541534 ; | [Y]US3098477 (WILLIAM LOTTER); | [Y]US3418921 (FAUTZ HOWARD C); | [Y]US5065734 (ELLIOTT BERNARD [US]); | [Y]US5799645 (STRADER MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]USRE32754E |