EP1313574 - COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING AMMONIA OXIDIZING BACTERIA TO INCREASE PRODUCTION OF NITRIC OXIDE AND NITRIC OXIDE PRECURSORS AND METHODS OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHITLOCK, David R. 40 Nash Street Watertown, MA 02172 / US | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01963935.0 | 10.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001US25248 | Priority number, date | US20000224598P | 11.08.2000 Original published format: US 224598 P | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0213982 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1313574 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313574 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, C02F3/30 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
D06M16/003 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,BR,US);
A61K35/74 (KR);
A23L13/74 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,BR,US);
A61K35/741 (EP,BR,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/365 (EP,US);
A61K8/42 (EP,US);
A61K8/99 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/70 (EP,BR,US);
A61L15/36 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMMONIAK-OXIDIERENDE BAKTERIEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR STEIGERUNG DER STICKOXIDPRODUKTION, STICKOXID-VORLÄUFER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2003/22] | English: | COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING AMMONIA OXIDIZING BACTERIA TO INCREASE PRODUCTION OF NITRIC OXIDE AND NITRIC OXIDE PRECURSORS AND METHODS OF USING SAME | [2003/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE BACTERIES OXYDANT L'AMMONIAC POUR AUGMENTER LA PRODUCTION D'OXYDE NITRIQUE ET DE PRECURSEURS D'OXYDE NITRIQUE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 12.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 19.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | IT | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | TR | 29.10.2008 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | ES | 09.02.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
IT | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
ES | 09.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 09.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59135845 ; | [X]JPH02169092 ; | [XD]US5314542 (CASSIDY EDWARD J [US], et al); | [X]EP0780419 (HOLLAND BIOMATERIALS GROUP B V [NL]); | [X]WO9827991 (STANDA LAB SA [FR], et al); | International search | [X]US5821112 (BOTTO WILLISM S [US], et al); | [X]US5849180 (SUMINO TATSUO [JP], et al) |