EP1374055 - CALL CENTER ADMINISTRATION MANAGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2008/51] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Oracle Systems Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Telephony@Work, Inc. 4225 Executive Square, Suite 600 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Telephony@Work, Inc 4225 Executive Square, Suite 600 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EZERZER, Ran 531 Front Street San Diego, CA 92101 / US | 02 /
HOLLY, Gerald, Augustin, Jr. 3535 Lebon Dr. 3310 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
JARQUIN, Roberto, Armando, Portillo 3925 Nobel Drive 18 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
ALJANE, Ali 4070 Mahaila Avenue, Unit C San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 05 /
BORODOW, Eli, Ben 535 Lebon Drive, 2401 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/33] | 01 /
EZERZER, Ran 531 Front Street San Diego, CA 92101 / US | ||
02 /
HOLLY, Gerald, Augustin, Jr. 3535 Lebon Dr. 3310 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
JARQUIN, Roberto, Armando, Portillo 3925 Nobel Drive 18 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
ALJANE, Ali 4070 Mahaila Avenue, Unit C San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
BORODOW, Eli, Ben 535 Lebon Drive, #2401 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
Former [2004/27] | 01 /
EZERZER, Ran 531 Front Street San Diego, CA 92101 / US | ||
02 /
HOLLY, Gerald, Augustin, Jr. 3535 Lebon Dr. 3310 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
JARQUIN, Roberto, Armando, Portillo 3925 Nobel Drive 18 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
ALJANE, Ali 4070 Mahaila Avenue, Unit C San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
BORODOW, Eli, Ben 535 Lebon Drive, #2401 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | |||
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
EZERZER, Ran 3535 Lebon Dr. 3310 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
HOLLY, Gerald, Augustin, Jr. 3535 Lebon Dr. 3310 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
JARQUIN, Roberto, Armando, Portillo 3925 Nobel Drive 18 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
ALJANE, Ali 7699 Palmill Drive 3309 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
BORODOW, Eli, Ben 9263 Regents Road B407 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01964033.3 | 14.08.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001US25526 | Priority number, date | US20010798226 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: US 798226 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02071226 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374055 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/30, G06F15/173 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04M3/5237 (EP);
H04L65/1069 (EP);
H04L65/401 (EP);
H04M3/5233 (EP);
H04L63/083 (EP);
H04L63/104 (EP);
H04L65/1016 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANRUFZENTRALEN-ADMINISTRATIONSMANAGER | [2004/01] | English: | CALL CENTER ADMINISTRATION MANAGER | [2004/01] | French: | GESTIONNAIRE D'ADMINISTRATION DE CENTRE D'APPELS | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.10.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | 19.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 07.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 11.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5185780 (LEGGETT ERNEST W [US]) [Y] 1,2,28,29 * column 2, lines 3-17 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 2 *; | [Y]US6175564 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,28,29* column 39, lines 11-25 * | International search | [YP]US6201804 (KIKINIS DAN [US]); | [YP]US6263066 (SHTIVELMAN YURI [US], et al); | [YE]US6295551 (ROBERTS PASHA [US], et al); | [YE]US6295353 (FLOCKHART ANDREW D [US], et al) | Examination | WO9960766 |