EP1325240 - SINTERED GEAR SHIFT SLEEVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miba Sinter Austria GmbH Dr. Mitterbauer-Strasse 3 4663 Laakirchen / AT | [2005/10] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Miba Sintermetall Aktiengesellschaft Dr. Mitterbauer-Strasse 3 4663 Laakirchen / AT | ||
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Miba Sintermetall Aktiengesellschaft Dr. Mitterbauer-Strasse 1 4663 Laakirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDNER, Christian Moosbergweg 6 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 01964719.7 | 13.09.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001AT00287 | Priority number, date | AT20000001734 | 12.10.2000 Original published format: AT 173400 | [2003/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0231374 | Date: | 18.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325240 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1325240 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16D23/06 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
B22F3/164 (EP);
B22F5/08 (EP);
F16D23/04 (EP);
F16D23/06 (EP);
B22F2003/166 (EP);
B22F2998/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/02, B22F3/10, B22F3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESINTERTE SCHALTMUFFE | [2003/28] | English: | SINTERED GEAR SHIFT SLEEVE | [2003/28] | French: | MANCHON DE COMMANDE FRITTE | [2003/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 26.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3618724 (OEHL ADOLF) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 41; figure 2 *; | [A]DE2510657 (DROESCHEL HELMUT) [A] 2 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 4; figure 20 *; | [A]US5096037 (KNOESS WALTER [DE], et al) [A] 3* column 2, line 19 - line 39 *; | [XA]DE19912131 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 31 - line 45; figures 2,9,10 * [A] 3 |