EP1318732 - ADHESIVE STICK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kores Holding Zug AG Baarerstrasse 112 6302 Zug / CH | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORESKA, Peter Nussdorfer Lände 29-33 1190 Wien / AT | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Weinzinger, Arnulf, et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Weinzinger, Arnulf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 01964721.3 | 17.09.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001AT00295 | Priority number, date | AT20000069120U | 20.09.2000 Original published format: AT 6912000 U | [2004/06] |
Former [2003/25] | AT20000000691 | 20.09.2000 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224023 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318732 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1318732 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/04 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
A45D40/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/12] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBESTIFT | [2003/25] | English: | ADHESIVE STICK | [2003/25] | French: | BATON D'ADHESIF | [2003/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 12.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9528857 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 3, line 4 - line 15 * * page 10, line 18 - line 23; figures 6-9 *; | [A]US5997201 (BOSSERT MARIE CLAUDE [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 22 - column 3, line 22 * * column 5, line 24 - line 39; figures 12,13 *; | [A]US4580920 (SCHMIDT GERHARD S E [CA]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 10 - line 14; figure - * |