EP1327101 - AMMONIA STORAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Australian Magnesium Corporation Pty., Ltd. Level 6, 9 Sherwood Road Toowong, QLD 4066 / AU | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states Australian Magnesium Corporation Pty., Ltd. Level 6, 9 Sherwood Road Toowong, QLD 4066 / AU | ||
For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROST, Malcolm, Timothy 104 Creekside Street Kenmore Hills, QLD 4069 / AU | 02 /
SHEEHAN, Gregory, John 9 Jillian Street Chapel Hill, QLD 4069 / AU | 03 /
KOENIG, Raymond, Louis 5 Quinty Street Fig Tree Pocket, QLD 4069 / AU | 04 /
TAIT, Peter, James 62 Currey Street Moorooka, QLD 4105 / AU | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Ward, David Ian Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street, Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01964757.7 | 10.09.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001AU01132 | Priority number, date | AU2000PR00001 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: AU PR000100 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0221040 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327101 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.03.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F17C11/00, C01C1/00 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
C01C1/003 (EP,US);
C01C1/02 (EP,US);
F17C11/00 (EP,US);
F17C9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/29] | F17C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERUNG VON AMMONIAK | [2003/29] | English: | AMMONIA STORAGE | [2003/29] | French: | STOCKAGE DE L'AMMONIAC | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 08.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1924892 (POWER GAS LTD) [X] 1,5,7-12 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1; claims 1-5 * [A] 2-4,6; | [A]US4013431 (BERKEL WILHELM, et al) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 8; example 1 * | International search | [A]EP0191993 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]); | [A]EP0315006 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]DE3926751 (LETTKO HERBERT AEROCHEM [DE]) |