EP1311916 - CONTEXT-DEPENDENT PROTOCOL CREATION SYSTEM AND METHOD, ESPECIALLY FOR USE IN THE FIELD OF PRODUCTION, ASSEMBLY, SERVICE OR MAINTENANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITZ, Soeren Am Hochberg 9a 91353 Wimmelbach / DE | [2003/21] | Application number, filing date | 01964888.0 | 09.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001DE03049 | Priority number, date | DE2000141105 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041105 | DE2001116540 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10116540 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217026 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311916 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311916 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
G05B19/4183 (EP);
G05B2219/32014 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTEXTBEZOGENEN PROTOKOLLIERUNG INSBESONDERE IM UMFELD PRODUKTION, MONTAGE, SERVICE ODER WARTUNG | [2003/21] | English: | CONTEXT-DEPENDENT PROTOCOL CREATION SYSTEM AND METHOD, ESPECIALLY FOR USE IN THE FIELD OF PRODUCTION, ASSEMBLY, SERVICE OR MAINTENANCE | [2003/21] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT DE RAPPORTS LIE AU CONTEXTE, EN PARTICULIER DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA PRODUCTION, DU MONTAGE, DU SERVICE OU DE LA MAINTENANCE | [2003/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 08.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 11.05.2005 | IE | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | CY | 09.08.2005 | LU | 09.08.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2007/26] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
CY | 09.08.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0428135 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US5588109 (DICKINSON IAN J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6031545 (ELLENBY JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6037882 (LEVY DAVID H [US]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US6094625 (RALSTON STUART E [NZ]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document *; | [A] - DAUDE R ET AL, "HEAD-MOUNTED DISPLAY ALS FACHARBEITERORIENTIERTE UNTERSTUETZUNGSKOMPONENTE AN CNC-WERKZEUGMASCHINEN", WERKSTATTSTECHNIK, SPRINGER VERLAG. BERLIN, DE, (19960501), vol. 86, no. 5, ISSN 0340-4544, pages 248 - 252, XP000585192 [A] 1,6 * page 248 - page 252 * | [A] - KUZUOKA H, "SPATIAL WORKSPACE COLLABORATION: A SHAREVIEW VIDEO SUPPORT SYSTEM FOR REMOTE COLLABORATION CAPABILITY", STRIKING A BALANCE. MONTEREY, MAY 3 - 7, 1992, PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, READING, ADDISON WESLEY, US, (19920503), pages 533 - 540, XP000426833 [A] 1,6 * page 533; figure 540 * |