EP1317621 - HYDRAULICALLY TRANSLATED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATTES, Patrick An der Betteleiche 33 D 70569 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/24] | Application number, filing date | 01964904.5 | 11.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001DE03088 | Priority number, date | DE2000143625 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043625 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0220978 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317621 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/46, F16K31/02, H01L41/02, F02M47/02 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
F02M63/0026 (EP,US);
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M63/0036 (EP,US);
F02M2200/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCH ÜBERSETZTES VENTIL | [2003/24] | English: | HYDRAULICALLY TRANSLATED VALVE | [2003/24] | French: | SOUPAPE A TRANSLATION HYDRAULIQUE | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/20] | 12.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3713697 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,10 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 28; figure . *; | [X]DE19519192 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 48 - line 57; figure . *; | [X]DE19743668 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]DE19928589 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-3,6,10 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 5; figure 3 *; | [PX]WO0123743 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PX] 1-7,10* page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 15; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0477400 |