EP1423260 - A ROTARY TABLET PRESS AND A METHOD OF CLEANING SUCH A PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Courtoy N.V. Bergensesteenweg, 186 1500 Halle / BE | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIAENS, Dirk J. Deneyerstraat 4 B-1652 Beersel / BE | 02 /
VAN ZEGBROECK, Antonie Boekenstraat 59 B-9450 Kerksken / BE | 03 /
BOECKX, Jurgen Beukendreef 17 B-1820 Steenokkerzeel / BE | 04 /
VOGELEER, Jan Briel (WEE) 2 B-2880 Bornem / BE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/33] | 01 /
CHRISTIAENS, Dirk J. Deneyerstraat 4 B-1652 Beersel / BE | ||
02 /
VAN ZEGBROECK, Antonie Boekenstraat 59 B-9450 Kerksken / BE | |||
03 /
BOECKX, Jurgen Beukendreef 17 B-1820 Steenokkerzeel / BE | |||
04 /
VOGELEER, Jan Briel 2 B-2880 Bornem / BE | |||
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
CHRISTIAENS, Dirk J. Deneyerstraat 4 B-1652 Beersel / BE | ||
02 /
VAN ZEGBROECK, Antonie Boekenstraat 59 B-9450 Kerksken / BE | |||
03 /
BOECKX, Jurgen Beukendreef 17 B-1820 Steenokkerzeel / BE | |||
04 /
VOGELEER, Jan Buitenland 49 B-2880 Bornem / BE | Representative(s) | Olsen, Lau Lund, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Olsen, Lau Lund, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S, Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 01965500.0 | 05.09.2001 | [2004/23] | WO2001IB01631 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020499 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423260 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423260 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/08, B30B15/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B30B11/08 (EP,US);
B08B3/02 (EP,US);
B08B3/04 (EP,US);
B30B15/0023 (EP,US);
B30B15/0082 (EP,US);
B30B15/026 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RUNDLAUF-TABLETTIERPRESSE UND VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGEN EINER PRESSE | [2004/23] | English: | A ROTARY TABLET PRESS AND A METHOD OF CLEANING SUCH A PRESS | [2004/23] | French: | MACHINE A COMPRIMER ROTATIVE ET SON PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 11.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2007
18.03.2011
WITHDRAWN Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE Opponent's representative Graalfs, Edo, et al, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2007
18.03.2011
WITHDRAWN Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE Opponent's representative Graalfs, Edo, et al, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2007
12.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE Opponent's representative Graalfs, Edo, et al, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.10.2007
Fette GmbH Grabauer Strasse 24 21493 Schwarzenbek / DE Opponent's representative Graalfs, Edo, et al, et al Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring Siemons, Schildberg Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | 17.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.03.2011 | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 30.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2011 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | LU | 05.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
LU | 05.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
PT | 25.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0899199 ; | [A]JPS59218299 ; | [A]JPS6297799 ; | [A]DE2363921 (KORSCH SPEZIALFAB EMIL) [A] 1,3,7,18,27 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3999922 (SHIMADA YASUO) [A] 1-5,7,18,19 * abstract *; | [AD]US4259049 (WILLICH ROLF) [AD] 1,7,18* figure - *; | [AD]EP0288798 (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2,12,13,18 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0637507 (KORSCH PRESSEN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,18,20-24,27,28,31 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1050399 (FETTE WILHELM GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2,7,12,13,18 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08099199 A 19960416 (HATA TEKKOSHO:KK) [A] 1,18,20-24,28,31 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850420), vol. 009, no. 092, Database accession no. (M - 373), & JP59218299 A 19841208 (HATA TEKKOSHO:KK) [A] 1,18,20-22,27,28,31 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871009), vol. 011, no. 310, Database accession no. (M - 630), & JP62097799 A 19870507 (HATA TEKKOSHO:KK) [A] 1,18,20-24,28,31 * abstract * |