EP1323709 - UREA DERIVATIVE AND ADHESIVE-MOLECULE INHIBITOR CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshiya 2-17-22-702, Tsujido-shinmachi Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | 02 /
ISHIGAKI, Takeshi 3-20-1-504, Kamakurayama Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0031 / JP | 03 /
FUNAHASHI, Miyuki 7-1-3-A-2, Kugenumakaigan Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0037 / JP | 04 /
TANIGUCHI, Koji 1111-203, Tebiro Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0036 / JP | 05 /
KANEKO, Masayuki 2-3-8-G2, Tsunishi Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0034 / JP | 06 /
KAINOH, Mie 633-1-201, Fujisawa Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0052 / JP | 07 /
MEGURO, Hiroyuki 1111-301, Tebiro Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0036 / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01965644.6 | 14.09.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001JP07990 | Priority number, date | JP20000281040 | 14.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000281040 | [2003/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222563 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323709 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C275/26, C07D239/47, C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D403/12, C07D471/10, C07D491/107, C07D495/10, C07D233/54, A61K31/506, A61K31/175, A61K31/513, A61K31/55, A61P43/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/08 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
C07D235/02 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C275/26 (EP,US);
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARNSTOFFDERIVATE UND DIESE ALS WIRKSTOFF ENTHALTENDER ADHÄSIONSMOLEKÜLINHIBITOR | [2003/27] | English: | UREA DERIVATIVE AND ADHESIVE-MOLECULE INHIBITOR CONTAINING THE SAME AS ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2003/27] | French: | DERIVE D'UREE ET INHIBITEUR DE MOLECULE ADHESIVE CONTENANT CELUI-CI EN TANT QUE SUBSTANCE ACTIVE | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2003 | Translation filed | 09.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 09.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/46] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9920272 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0037429 (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO0114328 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al); | [AP]WO0121584 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [AP]WO0132610 (KAKEN PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) |