Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP1301467

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
CY 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IE 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 PT 
 SE 
 TR 
Examination procedure02.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase05.02.2003National basic fee paid 
05.02.2003Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2003Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
24.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
28.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted16.08.2006
Opposition procedure18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 25.07.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030205
 
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:16.04.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:NELSON, MARK, L.
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:FRECHETTE, ROGER
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:VISKI, PETER
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:ISMAIL, MOHAMED
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:BOWSER, TODD
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:DUMORNAY, JIMMY
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:RENNIE, GLEN
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:LIU, GUI
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:KOZA, DARRELL
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:SHEAHAN, PAUL
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:STAPLETON, KAREN
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:HAWKINS, PAUL
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:BHATIA, BEENA
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:VERMA, ATUL
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:MCINTYRE, LAURA
 
Event date:06.08.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:WARCHOL, TAD
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030730
 
Event date:16.08.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR
 
Event date:16.08.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:AL LT LV MK RO SI
 
Event date:16.08.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:15.09.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:28.09.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:60122341
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060928
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:20.09.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:15.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG
 
Event date:27.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:16.03.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070518
 
Event date:16.04.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2271070 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:29.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20061009
 
Event date:30.06.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070629
 
Event date:13.11.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PFA
Code Expl.: NAME/FIRM CHANGED
OWNER:PARATEK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Free Format Text:PARATEK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.#75 KNEELAND STREET#BOSTON, MA 02111 (US) $ TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE#4TH FLOOR, BALLOU HALL#MEDFORD, MA 02155 (US) -TRANSFER TO- PARATEK PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.#75 KNEELAND STREET#BOSTON, MA 02111 (US) $ TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE#4TH FLOOR, BALLOU HALL#MEDFORD, MA 02155 (US)
 
Event date:05.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20100618
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130612
 
Event date:14.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
REPRESENTATIVE:WAGNER PATENT AG, CH
 
Event date:31.03.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130629
 
Event date:29.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60122341 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:HASELTINE LAKE LLP, DE
 
Event date:18.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20060403922 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:28.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:27.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:26.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20200625
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20200604
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20200608
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20200609
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.07.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:16.08.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED.
Effective DATE:20060816
 
Event date:31.08.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20200619
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20200626
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20200629
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20200603
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.10.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20200701
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2020 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20200702
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:12.01.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 60122341 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
REPRESENTATIVE:HL KEMPNER PATENTANWALT, RECHTSANWALT, SOLICIT, DE
 
Event date:14.07.2006 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:09.05.2006 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3
 
Event date:15.12.2005 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:28.02.2003 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:22.06.2007 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:29.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 60122341 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:30.06.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20210628
 
Event date:05.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Expiry DATE:20210629
 
Event date:21.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20210628
 
Event date:12.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MM9A
Code Expl.:-LAPSED PATENTS
Effective DATE:20210629
 
Event date:03.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:19.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE MK
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20210629
 
Event date:15.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 336481 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20210629
 
Event date:13.07.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI MAE
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:31.08.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210628
 
Event date:04.08.2021 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MK9A
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:29.10.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210629
 
Event date:30.11.2021 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210707
 
Event date:04.01.2022 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20220104
 
Event date:31.01.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20210630
 
Event date:22.06.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261
 
Event date:30.06.2022 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20210629