EP1395213 - OPHTHALMIC SURGICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYBBS, Alexander 2588 Edgerton Road Cleveland, OH 44118 / US | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 01966468.9 | 01.09.2001 | [2004/11] | WO2001US27167 | Priority number, date | US20000229967P | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 229967 P | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0217834 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1395213 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1395213 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/013 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
A61F9/0133 (EP,US);
A61F9/013 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR DIE OPHTHALMOLOGISCHE CHIRURGIE | [2004/11] | English: | OPHTHALMIC SURGICAL SYSTEM | [2004/11] | French: | SYSTEME CHIRURGICAL D'OPHTALMOLOGIE | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 24.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07021998.5 / EP1891916 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | BE | 14.11.2007 | CH | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | LI | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
BE | 14.11.2007 | ||
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CH | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 14.11.2007 | |
LI | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9520920 (CHIRON VISION CORP [US]) [A] 2,30,31 * page 7, line 19 - line 23; figure 23 *; | [A]WO9621406 (CORNEAL CONTOURING DEV [US], et al) [A] 2,30,31 * page 17, line 24 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9720529 (CHIRON VISION CORP [US]) [A] 32 * page 6, line 10 - line 20; figure 2A *; | [DXA]WO9926568 (HAWKEN IND INC [US]) [DX] 30,31 * the whole document * [A] 1-5,7-15,17,19,21,34; | [PX]US6126668 (BAIR SCOTT S [US], et al) [PX] 1,3,14-17,19,22 * abstract * * column 12, line 7 - line 20 ** column 15, line 26 - line 30; figure 33 * | by applicant | WO9926568 | US6228099 |