EP1317846 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTATION OF PPPoE FOR BUS MODEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centillium Communications, Inc. 47211 Lakeview Boulevard Fremont, Ca 94538 / US | [2003/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODDAPANENI, Ashok Apartment 202, 555 E. El Camino Real Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
MORADI, Mohammad 1069 Yorktown Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 01966723.7 | 23.08.2001 | [2003/24] | WO2001US41870 | Priority number, date | US20000230051P | 01.09.2000 Original published format: US 230051 P | US20010755465 | 04.01.2001 Original published format: US 755465 | [2003/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0219684 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1317846 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
H04L12/2859 (EP);
H04L12/2881 (EP);
H04L12/6418 (EP);
H04M11/062 (EP);
H04L2012/6478 (EP);
H04L2212/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINER PUNKT-ZU-PUNKT-VERBINDUNG ÜBER ETHERNET FUR MODEM-BUSSEN | [2003/24] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTATION OF PPPoE FOR BUS MODEMS | [2003/24] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE UTILES POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LE PROTOCOLE POINT-A-POINT SUR ETHERNET POUR DES MODEMS DE BUS | [2003/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0038371 (COVAD COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 25 * * page 2, line 10 - line 15 * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 17 * * claims 1,2,15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5142680 (FLAGG DENIS T ET AL) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - line 32 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 2 * * claims 1,2 * |