EP1311571 - AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF PYRAZOLE BLOCKED POLYISOCYANATES AND COATINGS PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/21] | AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS | ||
[2005/05] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELCHIORS, Martin Am Sandberg 35 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 02 /
IRLE, Christoph Sant Lluis 8 08960 Sant Just Desvern, Barcelona / ES | 03 /
PETZOLDT, Joachim Iltisstrasse 2 40789 Monheim / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Heino Opladener Str.129 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2003/21] | Application number, filing date | 01967230.2 | 01.08.2001 | [2003/21] | WO2001EP08892 | Priority number, date | DE2000152875 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10052875 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214395 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1311571 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1311571 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/00 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
C09D175/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4288 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/706 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3275 (EP,US);
C08G18/12, C08G18/807 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE DISPERSIONEN AUS PYRAZOL-BLOCKIERTEN POLYISOCYANATEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2003/21] | English: | AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS OF PYRAZOLE BLOCKED POLYISOCYANATES AND COATINGS PREPARED THEREFROM | [2005/05] | French: | DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES DE POLYISOCYANATES BLOQUEES AVEC PYRAZOLES ET REVETEMENTS PREPAREES DE CELLE | [2005/05] |
Former [2003/21] | AQUEOUS DISPERSIONS | ||
Former [2003/21] | DISPERSIONS AQUEUSES | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 04.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2006
02.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Heinemann, Monica, et al, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2006
02.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Heinemann, Monica, et al, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.04.2006
02.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE DuPont Performance Coatings GmbH & Co.KG Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Heinemann, Monica, et al, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | 22.06.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.03.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/34] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.08.2005 | FI | 17.08.2005 | IE | 17.08.2005 | TR | 17.08.2005 | DK | 17.11.2005 | GR | 17.11.2005 | LU | 01.08.2006 | CH | 31.08.2006 | LI | 31.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 17.08.2005 | |
FI | 17.08.2005 | ||
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2006 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
IT | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2006 | ||
LI | 31.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
TR | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
DK | 17.11.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
IE | 17.08.2005 | ||
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
GR | 17.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0159117 (BAXENDEN CHEM [GB]) [AD] 1-11 * page 2, line 10 - page 2, line 23; claims 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0427028 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * page 5, line 43 - page 6, line 6 ** claim 1 *; | [A]EP0807650 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * examples 1,2 * * column 13, lines 30-34 * * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0942023 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 7 * * claims 1-3 * |