EP1327154 - TESTING SYSTEM IN A CIRCUIT BOARD MANUFACTURING LINE FOR AUTOMATIC TESTING OF CIRCUIT BOARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cencorp Oyj Maksjoentie 11 08700 Virkkala / FI | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states PMJ Automec Oyj Maksjoentie 11 08700 Virkkala / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEPPÄLÄ, Hannu Lopentie 50 FIN-24260 Salo / FI | 02 /
KURPPA, Pekka Kiurukatu 37 B FIN-24130 Salo / FI | 03 /
TEERI, Jarmo Nallenpiha 10 as 1 FIN-24100 Salo / FI | [2003/29] | Representative(s) | Tanskanen, Jarmo Tapio, et al Papula Oy ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Tanskanen, Jarmo Tapio, et al Papula Oy, P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01967398.7 | 21.09.2001 | [2003/29] | WO2001FI00829 | Priority number, date | FI20000002086 | 21.09.2000 Original published format: FI 20002086 | [2003/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0225301 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1327154 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1327154 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
G01R31/2808 (EP,US);
G01R31/2806 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53196 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÜFSYSTEM IN EINER LEITERPLATTEN-HERSTELLUNGSLINIE FÜR DIE AUTOMATISIERTE PRÜFUNG VON LEITERPLATTEN | [2003/29] | English: | TESTING SYSTEM IN A CIRCUIT BOARD MANUFACTURING LINE FOR AUTOMATIC TESTING OF CIRCUIT BOARDS | [2003/29] | French: | SYSTEME D'ESSAI DANS UNE CHAINE DE FABRICATION DE CARTES DE CIRCUIT IMPRIME | [2003/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 30.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2008 | CY | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | GR | 21.05.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | LU | 21.09.2008 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
TR | 20.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 21.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
LU | 21.09.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 20.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0989960 ; | [A]JPH01259271 ; | [A]US4845843 (BABCOCK DOUGLAS M [US]); | [A]GB2229540 (ENGINEERING & ELECTRONIC SUPPL [GB]); | [A]DE4416755 (PEMATECH GMBH [DE]); | [XP]US6232766 (SAOULI MOHAMAD ALI [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP09089960 A 19970404 (KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP01259271 A 19891016 (AWA ENG K.K.) |