EP1316220 - METHOD FOR COMPRESSING/DECOMPRESSING STRUCTURED DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expway 16, rue Vauthier le Noir 51100 Reims / FR | [2004/52] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Expway 15, rue Vauthier le Noir 51100 Reims / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIENOT, Cédric 115, rue Oberkampf F-75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
SEYRAT, Claude 13, Impasse du Jeu de Boules F-75001 Paris / FR | [2003/30] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
THIENOT, Cédric 115, rue Oberkampf F-75011 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
SEYRAT, Claude 12, rue Rollin F-75005 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | de Roquemaurel, Bruno, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | de Roquemaurel, Bruno, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01967412.6 | 31.08.2001 | [2003/23] | WO2001FR02719 | Priority number, date | FR20000011356 | 06.09.2000 Original published format: FR 0011356 | [2003/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0221848 | Date: | 14.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316220 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316220 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
H04N21/2353 (EP,US);
H04N19/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG VON STRUKTURIERTEN DOKUMENTEN | [2004/26] | English: | METHOD FOR COMPRESSING/DECOMPRESSING STRUCTURED DOCUMENTS | [2003/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMPRESSION/DECOMPRESSION DE DOCUMENTS STRUCTURES | [2003/23] |
Former [2003/23] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KODIERUNG UND -DEKODIERUNG STRUKTURIERTEN DOKUMENTEN | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 21.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.08.2005 | [2007/20] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0650130 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 52 - page 8, line 55 *; | [A]WO9734240 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 14 - line 23 *; | [XA] - LIEFKE H ; SUCIU D, "XMill: an efficient compressor for XML data", 2000 ACM SIGMOD. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, Dallas, TX, USA, (20000516), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 153 - 164, XP002168802 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/342009.335405 | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Technique to Generate very Efficient Compression/Decompression Engines for XML Data Streams Based on the Stream's DTD", IBM RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Havant, UK, article No. 430188, (20000201), no. 430, page 399, XP002168803 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |