EP1422990 - CUTTING WIRE FOR BRUSH CUTTERS AND EDGE TRIMMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speed France S.A.S. Parc d'Activités d'Arnas 53, rue de Chavanne 69400 Arnas / FR | [2012/42] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states SPEED FRANCE Parc d'Activités d'Arnas 53 Rue de Chavanne 69400 Arnas / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGRAND, Emmanuel Le Bourg 01480 Villeneuve / FR | [2012/37] |
Former [2004/23] | 01 /
LEGRAND, Emmanuel LE BOURG F-01480 VILLENEUVE / FR | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2004/23] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01967421.7 | 03.09.2001 | [2004/23] | WO2001FR02730 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020008 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422990 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422990 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/416 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
A01D34/4168 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2976 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2978 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | MÄHFADEN FÜR BUSCH- UND KANTENTRIMMER | [2004/23] | English: | CUTTING WIRE FOR BRUSH CUTTERS AND EDGE TRIMMERS | [2004/23] | French: | FIL DE COUPE POUR DEBROUSSAILLEUSES ET TAILLE-BORDURES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.01.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | IE | 03.09.2013 | LU | 03.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 03.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 03.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
IE | 03.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 13.02.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4054993 (KAMP WALTER B, et al); | [X]US4186239 (MIZE CHARLES J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,12 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 1; figure 9 *; | [A]FR2658698 (STIHL ANDREAS [DE]); | [A]WO9719584 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE], et al) [A] 13 * page 6, line 18 - line 19 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 32 *; | [X]WO9743469 (BLOCH KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,12 * page 26, line 18 - page 27, line 26; figure 12B; claim 14 *; | [A]DE19632721 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]FR2793648 (SPEED FRANCE [FR]) |