Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2002030054 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0108034 | 17.09.2001 | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1235389 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2005 | A4 | EP1235389 | 28.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0108034 | 17.09.2001 | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7287282 | 23.10.2007 | B2 | US2003110378 | 12.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP0108034 | 17.09.2001 | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0230054 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100485096B | Global Dossier | 25.04.2005 | B1 | KR20020084067 | 04.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW576069B | 11.02.2004 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2000298590 | 29.09.2000 |