EP1235389 - COPYRIGHT PROTECTIVE SYSTEM, TRANSMITTER, RECEIVER, BRIDGE DEVICE, COPYRIGHT PROTECTIVE METHOD, MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Masazumi 11-14-301,Ikutamacho Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 543-0071 / JP | 02 /
Iitsuka, Hiroyuki 6-25-6, Kisaichi Katano-shi Osaka 576-0033 / JP | 03 /
Usuki, Naoshi 26-12,Hashimotoisoku Yawata-shi Kyo to 614-8331 / JP | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01967691.5 | 17.09.2001 | [2002/35] | WO2001JP08034 | Priority number, date | JP20000002985 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000002985 | [2002/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0230054 | Date: | 11.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235389 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G06F13/00, H04L29/06 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
G06F15/00 (KR);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G06F21/85 (EP,US);
H04L12/462 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04L63/068 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2103 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2129 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/35] | H04L12/28, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | URHEBESRECHTSCHUTZSYSTEM, ÜBERTRAGER, EMPFÄNGER, BRÜCKENGERÄT. URHEBERRECHTSCHUTZ-VERFAHREN, MITTEL UND PROGRAMM | [2002/35] | English: | COPYRIGHT PROTECTIVE SYSTEM, TRANSMITTER, RECEIVER, BRIDGE DEVICE, COPYRIGHT PROTECTIVE METHOD, MEDIUM, AND PROGRAM | [2002/35] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DES DROITS D'AUTEUR, EMETTEUR, RECEPTEUR, DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE DE CONNEXION, SUPPORT ET PROGRAMME ASSOCIES | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2002 | Translation filed | 27.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 27.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0715245 (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 1-51 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 41 * * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 20 * * page 20, line 51 - page 21, line 50 *; | [A]WO0042492 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-51 * abstract * * page 39, line 17 - page 40, line 11 *; | [Y] - "5C Digital Transmission Content Protection White Paper", INTERNET WHITE PAPER, (19980714), XP002213172 [Y] 1-51 * page 1 - page 7 * | [A] - "MPEG-4 INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & PROTECTION (IPMP) OVERVIEW & APPLICATIONS DOCUMENT", INTERNATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR STANDARDIZATION - ORGANISATION INTERNATIONALE DE NORMALISATION, (199812), pages 1 - 8, XP000997243 [A] 1-51 * Section 4 and subsections * | International search | [Y]JPH07200492 (CSK CORP); | [Y]JP2000165376 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |