EP1429527 - SERVICE SYSTEM WHICH PROVIDES SERVICES AFTER CONFIRMATION OF TELEPHONE NUMBER OF CALLER, SERVICE METHOD, AND MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Net Corp. Nipponkodokai Bldg, 3-1-6, Nishikanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0065 / JP | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Yukio, c/o Bell Net Corp. Nipponkodokai Bldg., 3-1-6, Nishikanda, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0065 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01967723.6 | 18.09.2001 | [2004/25] | WO2001JP08108 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03026263 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429527 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M3/38, H04M3/493 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
H04W8/265 (EP,US);
H04M3/382 (EP,US);
H04M3/42153 (EP,US);
H04M3/493 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US);
H04M2242/22 (EP,US);
H04M3/42059 (EP,US);
H04M3/42161 (EP,US);
H04M7/006 (EP,US);
H04M7/128 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | H04M3/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIENSTSYSTEM, DAS DIENSTE NACH BESTÄTIGUNG DER RUFNUMMER DES ANRUFERS BEREITSTELLT, DIENSTVERFAHREN UND MEDIUM | [2004/25] | English: | SERVICE SYSTEM WHICH PROVIDES SERVICES AFTER CONFIRMATION OF TELEPHONE NUMBER OF CALLER, SERVICE METHOD, AND MEDIUM | [2004/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE SERVICES FOURNISSANT DES SERVICES APRES CONFIRMATION DU NUMERO DE TELEPHONE DE L'APPELANT, PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2003 | Translation filed | 27.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 31.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/38] | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 14.05.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 14.05.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 14.05.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 14.05.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | 14.05.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.05.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   14.05.2004 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0841828 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP0876042 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6222915 (MUELLER CHRISTEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0167791 (CHOI SOO HYUK [KR]) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 2 - line 26 * * page 3, line 21 - page 5, line 29 * | International search | [A]JPH10164266 (XING INC, et al) |