EP1429471 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING LEAKAGE TRANSMISSION LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-0002 / JP | |||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMIYA, Norihiro, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
FUKAE, Tadamasa, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI K. K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
MORIHARA, Kenji, c/o MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
KAWAKAMI, Takashi, c/o CENTRAL JAPAN RAILWAY CO. 1-4, Meieki 1-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-0002 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postafch 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/25] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01967732.7 | 19.09.2001 | [2004/25] | WO2001JP08150 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028243 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429471 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B5/00 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H04B5/28 (EP,US);
H04B7/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM MIT EINER LECK-ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNG | [2004/25] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM USING LEAKAGE TRANSMISSION LINE | [2004/25] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION UTILISANT UNE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION A COURANT DE FUITE | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2003 | Translation filed | 19.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2003 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 07.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH0638348U ; | [X]JPH11186943 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |