EP1309688 - G PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | ||
Former [2004/31] | For all designated states Pfizer Health AB 112 87 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIND, Peter Borjegatan 31C S-751 29 Uppsala / SE | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01967975.2 | 15.08.2001 | [2003/20] | WO2001US25513 | Priority number, date | US20000225262P | 15.08.2000 Original published format: US 225262 P | [2003/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0214496 | Date: | 21.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1309688 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C07K16/28, C12N5/10, C12N15/86, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12N2799/021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Extension states | AL | 07.03.2003 | LT | 07.03.2003 | LV | 07.03.2003 | MK | 07.03.2003 | RO | 07.03.2003 | SI | 07.03.2003 | Title | German: | G-PROTEIN GEKOPPELTE REZEPTOREN | [2003/20] | English: | G PROTEIN-COUPLED RECEPTORS | [2003/20] | French: | RECEPTEURS COUPLES A LA PROTEINE G | [2003/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.03.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/09] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO0136471 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-21,25-43,45,46,48-51,53-79 * SEQ ID NO:17: 100% identity in 321 nt overlap (1-321:589-909) with SEQ ID NO:1 * * SEQ ID NO:18: 100% identity in 107 aa overlap (1-107:197-303) with SEQ ID NO:2. *; | [X]WO0015793 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,9-21,25-30,32-39,53-55,67-71,73,75-77 * page 39 - page 48 * * SEQ ID NO:4: 65.7% identity in 105 aa overlap (1-105:225-329) with SEQ ID NO:2. * * SEQ ID NO:10: 70% identity in 320 nt overlap (1-320:822-1141) with SEQ ID NO:1. *; | [X] - PHILLIMORE B., "Human DNA sequence from clone RP11-432E15 on chromosome 123 contains STSs, GSSs and a CpG island", EMBL, (20000203), Database accession no. AL138708, URL: EMBL, XP002191512 [X] 3,7,9-21,25-29 * abstract * |