EP1318982 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING AMYLOID-RELATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Company LLC 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, MI 49001 / US | ||
For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | ||
For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN S.p.A. Via Robert Koch, 1.2 20152 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAUB, Thomas, J. 7184 Lakeridge Place Texas, MI 49009 / US | 02 /
TANIS, Steven, P. 7601 Farmington Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | 03 /
BUHL, Allen, Edwin 5120 Brennerton Drive Portage, MI 49002 / US | 04 /
CARTER, Donald, Bainbridge 827 West Inkster Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | 05 /
BANDIERA, Tiziano C.so Vittorio Emanuele, 44/A I-27025 Gambolo-Pavia / IT | 06 /
LANSEN, Jacqueline Via Ungaretti, 17 I-20028 San Vittore Olona / IT | 07 /
PELLERANO, Cesare Via Casato di Sopra, 19 I-53100 Siena / IT | 08 /
SAVINI, Luisa Via Salicotto, 131 I-53100 Siena / IT | 09 /
SAWADA, Geri A. 6313 Westshire Street Portage, MI 49024 / US | 10 /
FICI, Gregory J. 1964 N. 26th Street Kalamazoo, MI 49048 / US | [2003/34] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
RAUB, Thomas, J. 7184 Lakeridge Place Texas, MI 49009 / US | ||
02 /
TANIS, Steven, P. 7601 Farmington Avenue Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | |||
03 /
BUHL, Allen, Edwin 5120 Brennerton Drive Portage, MI 49002 / US | |||
04 /
CARTER, Donald, Bainbridge 827 West Inkster Kalamazoo, MI 49008 / US | |||
05 /
BANDIERA, Tiziano C.so Vittorio Emanuele, 44/A I-27025 Gambolo-Pavia / IT | |||
06 /
LANSEN, Jacqueline Via Ungaretti, 17 I-20028 San Vittore Olona / IT | |||
07 /
PELLERANO, Cesare Via Casato di Sopra, 19 I-53100 Siena / IT | |||
08 /
SAVINI, Luisa Via Salicotto, 131 I-53100 Siena / IT | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 01968919.9 | 17.09.2001 | [2003/25] | WO2001US29010 | Priority number, date | US20000234611P | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 234611 P | US20000667357 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: US 667357 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0224652 | Date: | 28.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1318982 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/38, A61K31/47 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K51/0455 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/47, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/47, A61K31/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/25] | Extension states | AL | 08.04.2003 | LT | 08.04.2003 | LV | 08.04.2003 | MK | 08.04.2003 | RO | 08.04.2003 | SI | 08.04.2003 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON AMYLOID VERWANDTEN STÖRUNGEN | [2003/25] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DIAGNOSING AND TREATING AMYLOID-RELATED CONDITIONS | [2003/25] | French: | COMPOSES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE DIAGNOSTIQUER ET DE TRAITER DES CONDITIONS LIEES AUX AMYLOIDES | [2003/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 01.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/03] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/03] | Request for further processing for: | 03.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 17.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2003 | 30.09.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0503349 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK]) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5811456 (SEMAN MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5891909 (SOLL RICHARD M [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - T.TAYA ET. AL., "Complexation Behaviour of Heterocyclic Hydrazones. II. Effects of Steric Factors on Formation Constants for Nickel(II) Complexes with Heterocyclic Hydrazones.", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (1994), vol. 67, no. 3, pages 710 - 9, XP001027593 [X] 30-32 * page 710, column 2, paragraph 2 * | [X] - F. H. CASE, "Synthesis and Chelation Properties of Hydrazones Derived from Isoquinoline-1-carboxaldehyde, 2-Quinoxalinecarboxaldehyde, 4-Isoquinolylhydrazine and 2-Quinoxalylhydrazine.", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (198412), vol. 56, no. 14, pages 2860 - 2, XP001026964 [X] 30-32 * Table 1, compound XIII * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac00278a053 | [A] - KRASAVIN, I.A. ET. A., "Syntheses in the Quinoline Series. III. 2-Formyl-8-hydroxyquinoline Derivatives.", CHEMISTRY OF HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUNDS (ENGLISH TRANSLATION), pages 190 - 4, XP001026912 [A] 1-34 * page 191, compounds III and IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00945333 | [A] - T. RUDOLPH ET. AL., "2-Hydrazino-8-quinolol and Derivatives", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (196703), vol. 10, no. 2, page 981, XP001027535 [A] 1-34 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00317a068 |