Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217643 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2003 | A8 | WO0217643 | 06.09.2002 | A3 | WO0217643 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217639B1 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2003 | B1 | WO0217639 | 30.05.2002 | A3 | WO0217639 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217621 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2002 | A3 | WO0217621 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217620 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2002 | A3 | WO0217620 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22706200 | 21.08.2000 | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93435401 | 20.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7526723 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2009 | B2 | US2003142127 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US34765603 | 16.01.2003 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | US34887302 | 16.01.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004519116 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US0126369 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1312219 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US0141897 | 27.08.2001 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1312214 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US0126369 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1312205 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2017 | B1 | EP1312205 | 21.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0141896 | 27.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU9127601 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US0141897 | 27.08.2001 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8916301 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0141896 | 27.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8916201 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US0141894 | 27.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8668101 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US22706200 | 21.08.2000 | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93435401 | 20.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US0126370 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8668001 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US0126369 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001291276B | Global Dossier | 24.03.2005 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US0141897 | 27.08.2001 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001289163 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0141896 | 27.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2001289162B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US0141894 | 27.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1312218 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US0141894 | 27.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2419409 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US0126369 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2420379 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0141896 | 27.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2420857 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US0141894 | 27.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2423988 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US0141897 | 27.08.2001 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7213255 | 01.05.2007 | B2 | US2002026637 | 28.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US93410801 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002057286 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US743701 | 30.11.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002059629 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22706200 | 21.08.2000 | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93435401 | 20.08.2001 | US22800200 | 25.08.2000 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6760043 | 06.07.2004 | B2 | US2002087986 | 04.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7162697 | 09.01.2007 | B2 | US2002088008 | 04.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6791579 | 14.09.2004 | B2 | US2002089530 | 11.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US22706300 | 21.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 | US93392701 | 21.08.2001 | US94124601 | 27.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0217642B1 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2003 | B1 | WO0217642 | 13.06.2002 | A3 | WO0217642 | 28.02.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22791800 | 25.08.2000 | US93549201 | 23.08.2001 | US22793000 | 25.08.2000 |