06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
05.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.08.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
28.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
09.09.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] |
02.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.08.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - inventor |
|
15.04.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
15.04.2016 |
Change - English title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
15.04.2016 |
Change - French title |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
02.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.12.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] |
22.11.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.07.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] |
01.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.05.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
08.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
29.11.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
29.11.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
18.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
02.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|