Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1275269 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | B1 | EP1275269 | 15.01.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0009287 | 15.04.2000 | GB0101597 | 10.04.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0178486 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2002 | A3 | WO0178486 | 25.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0009287 | 15.04.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2361395 | 05.01.2005 | B | GB2361395 | 17.10.2001 | A | GB0009287D0 | 31.05.2000 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0009287 | 15.04.2000 |