EP1322471 - MACHINE-READABLE SELF-ADHESIVE LABEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2003/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOUDEAU, Detlef Blumenstrasse 28 84085 Langenquaid / DE | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Epping, Hermann, Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | Hermann, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Epping, Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01969221.9 | 07.08.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001DE03013 | Priority number, date | DE2000145196 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045196 | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0222359 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1322471 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B32B33/00, G06K19/077 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
G06K19/0776 (EP,US);
G06K19/041 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Title | German: | MASCHINENLESBARES SELBSTKLEBENDES ETIKETT | [2003/27] | English: | MACHINE-READABLE SELF-ADHESIVE LABEL | [2003/27] | French: | ETIQUETTE AUTOCOLLANTE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 18.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0827108 (LINTEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 43 * * figure 6 * * example 3G * * claims 1,8 *; | [X]EP1018703 (SIHL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 2 * * figures 3,4 * * examples 1,3 * * claims 1,4 *; | [X]JPH11250218 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991222), vol. 1999, no. 14, & JP11250218 A 19990917 (NAVITAS CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |