EP1303870 - HIGH PRESSURE PROCESSING CHAMBER FOR SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Tokyo Electron Limited 3-6 Akasaka, 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIBERGER, Maximilian, Albert 7258 E. Del Acero Drive Scottsdale, Arizona 85258 / US | 02 /
LAYMAN, Frederick, Paul 433 Miwok Court Fremont, CA 94538 / US | 03 /
SUTTON, Thomas, Robert 1790 Chevalier Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/17] | 01 /
BIBERGER, Maximilian, Albert 737-6 Loma Verde Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94302 / US | ||
02 /
LAYMAN, Frederick, Paul 433 Miwok Court Fremont, CA 94538 / US | |||
03 /
SUTTON, Thomas, Robert 1790 Chevalier Drive San Jose, CA 95124 / US | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01970053.3 | 24.07.2001 | [2003/17] | WO2001IB01761 | Priority number, date | US20000220883P | 26.07.2000 Original published format: US 220883 P | US20010283132P | 10.04.2001 Original published format: US 283132 P | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0209147 | Date: | 31.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1303870 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
H01L21/67126 (EP,US);
H01L21/00 (KR);
H01L21/67051 (EP,US);
H01L21/67748 (EP,US);
H01L21/67751 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCKSBEHANDLUNGSKAMMER FÜR HALBLEITERSCHEIBEN | [2003/17] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE PROCESSING CHAMBER FOR SEMICONDUCTOR SUBSTRATE | [2003/17] | French: | CHAMBRE DE TRAITEMENT HAUTE PRESSION POUR SUBSTRAT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2003/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]JP2000106358 ; | [XY]US5314574 (TAKAHASHI NOBUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10,14 * figures 5-7 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 44 * * column 7, lines 22-31 * [Y] 15; | [YA]US5328722 (GHANAYEM STEVE [US], et al) [Y] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1,7-9,14; | [XA]US5955140 (SMITH DOUGLAS M [US], et al) [X] 1,6,14 * figures 16A-17B * * page 26, line 64 - page 27, line 10 * * page 31, lines 11-13 * [A] 15-17; | [PXA]WO0110733 (S C FLUIDS INC [US]) [PX] 1,14 * the whole document * [AP] 15; | [PXA]WO0133615 (SUPERCRITICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1,14 * page 10, lines 28-36 *[AP] 15 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000106358 A 20000411 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,14 * abstract * [A] 15 |