EP1324847 - CHUCK ASSEMBLY HAVING IMPROVED INTERFACE ASSEMBLY FOR POWER DRIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/28] | CHUCK AND POWER DRIVER HAVING IMPROVED INTERFACE ASSEMBLY | ||
[2008/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POWER TOOL HOLDERS, Inc. 16 West Main Street Christiana, DE 19702 / US | [2003/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAKSICH, Theodore, G. 107 Marian Lane Seneca, SC 29678 / US | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01970563.1 | 21.08.2001 | [2003/28] | WO2001US26093 | Priority number, date | US20000226632P | 21.08.2000 Original published format: US 226632 P | US20000226631P | 21.08.2000 Original published format: US 226631 P | US20010841952 | 25.04.2001 Original published format: US 841952 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0216066 | Date: | 28.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1324847 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1324847 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.02.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/12 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
B23B31/123 (EP,US);
B23B31/1238 (EP,US);
B23B31/1253 (EP,US);
B23B2231/38 (EP,US);
B23B2231/44 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17632 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [2004/21] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPANNFUTTER MIT VERBESSERTER SCHNITTSTELLENBAUEINHEIT FÜR KRAFTANTRIEB | [2009/10] | English: | CHUCK ASSEMBLY HAVING IMPROVED INTERFACE ASSEMBLY FOR POWER DRIVER | [2008/30] | French: | ENSEMBLE MANDRIN À INTERFACE AMELIORE POUR ENTRAÎNEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2008/30] |
Former [2003/28] | SPANNFUTTER UND LEISTUNGSTREIBER MIT VERBESERTER SCHNITSTELLENBAUEINHEIT | ||
Former [2003/28] | CHUCK AND POWER DRIVER HAVING IMPROVED INTERFACE ASSEMBLY | ||
Former [2003/28] | MANDRIN ET ENTRAINEMENT MECANIQUE A ENSEMBLE INTERFACE AMELIORE | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2003 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.07.2008 | 18.06.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | [2010/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5988653 (KUO WEN-CHIN [TW]) [X] 1-6,10 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 25 * * figures 1-63 *; | [Y]DE29919844U (CHUM POWER MACHINERY CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-6,10,11,14-20 * the whole document * * Especially page 6, lines 1-8 and 29-33. *; | [Y]US6007071 (MIDDLETON IAN [GB]) [Y] 1-6,10,11,14-20 * column 4, line 43 - line 59 * * figure 4 *; | [A]DE29913083U (CHUM POWER MACHINERY CORP [TW]) [A] 1-6,10,11,14-20 * page 5, line 4 - line 23 * * figures 6-9 * | International search | [YP]US6173972 (TEMPLE-WILSON RICHARD E [GB], et al); | [YP]US6247706 (KUO WEN-CHIN [TW]); | [Y]US4395170 (CLAREY MICHAEL E); | [Y]US5011343 (SABAN ODED [IL], et al); | [Y]US2844378 (WHISTLER LAWRENCE V, et al); | [Y]US3390897 (BUELL MOORE); | [A]US5988653 (KUO WEN-CHIN [TW]); | [AP]US6257596 (YANG WEN YUNG [TW]) |