03.07.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
10.03.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
11.11.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.10.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.09.2008 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
26.03.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
05.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.11.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
23.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|