EP1314198 - OVERLAY MARKS, METHODS OF OVERLAY MARK DESIGN AND METHODS OF OVERLAY MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA-Tencor Corporation 160 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134-1809 / US | [2017/10] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states KLA-Tencor Corporation 160 Rio Robles San Jose, CA 95134-1809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADEL, Michael 14 Yigal Alon Street 30900 Zichron Ya'akov / IL | 02 /
GHINOVKER, Mark 812/22 Shalom Aleichem Street 10500 Migdal Haemek / IL | 03 /
MIEHER, Walter Dean 1750 Nantucket Circle No. 332 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Keane, Paul Fachtna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Lukaszyk, Szymon, et al Kancelaria Patentowa Lukaszyk ul. Glowackiego 8/6 40-062 Katowice / PL | ||
Former [2012/07] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/20] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/22] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 01971384.1 | 28.08.2001 | [2003/22] | WO2001US41932 | Priority number, date | US20000229256P | 30.08.2000 Original published format: US 229256 P | US20010894987 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 894987 | US20010301591P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 301591 P | US20010301484P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 301484 P | US20010301613P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 301613 P | US20010301763P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 301763 P | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0219415 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1314198 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314198 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66, H01L23/544, G03F7/20 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G03F7/70633 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2016/42] |
Former [2004/22] | DE, FR, GB, NL | ||
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUSRICHTSMARKEN, METHODEN ZUM ENTWURF VON AUSRICHTMARKEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN VON AUSRICHTFEHLERN | [2016/38] | English: | OVERLAY MARKS, METHODS OF OVERLAY MARK DESIGN AND METHODS OF OVERLAY MEASUREMENTS | [2003/22] | French: | REPERE DE SUPERPOSITION, PROCEDES SERVANT A CONCEVOIR DES REPERES DE SUPERPOSITION ET PROCEDES DE MESURE DE SUPERPOSITION | [2016/39] |
Former [2003/22] | AUSRICHT SMARKEN, METHODEN ZUM ENTWURF VON AUSRICHTMARKEN, UND VERFAHREN ZUMMESSEN VON AUSRICHTFEHLERN | ||
Former [2003/22] | REPERE DE RECOUVREMENT, PROCEDES SERVANT A CONCEVOIR DES REPERES DE RECOUVREMENT ET PROCEDES DE MESURE DE RECOUVREMENT | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 23.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.08.2017 | [2018/37] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4820055 (MUELLER KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [Y] 32-35,39-49,51-57 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5172190 (KAISER PAUL [DE]) [Y] 1-12,14,15,17,18,22,23,25-28 * figure 1; claims 1-3,8 *; | [A]EP0818814 (KLA INSTR CORP [US]) [A] 1-57 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 21 * * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 34 *; | [Y]US5841144 (CRESSWELL MICHAEL WILLIAM [US]) [Y] 1-12,14,15,17,18,22,23,25-28,32-35,39-49,51-57 * column 5, line 6 - line 14; claims 1,4-6 *; | [A]EP0947828 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-57 * figure 2; claim 2 *; | [A]US6079256 (BAREKET NOAH [US]) [A] 1-57* column 11, line 6 - line 19 *; | [A]US6084679 (STEFFAN PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-57 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0281030 | EP0634702 | US5805290 | by applicant | EP0281030 | EP0634702 |