EP1323258 - SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING OBJECTS DISTRIBUTED OVER A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Probix, Inc. Building A, Suite A200, 883 North Shoreline Boulevard Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2003/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORDEMANN, David, A. 1724 Oak Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 02 /
ROBINSON, Daniel, J. 1992 Hastings Court Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
SCHEIBE, Paul, O. 3 Still Creek Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Käck, Jürgen Kahler Käck Mollekopf Patentanwälte Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01971427.8 | 13.09.2001 | [2003/27] | WO2001US42147 | Priority number, date | US20000232599P | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 232599 P | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0223798 | Date: | 21.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1323258 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
H04L63/1408 (EP,US);
H04L12/22 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
H04L63/1425 (EP,US);
H04L9/321 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SCHUTZ VON OBJEKTEN, DIE ÜBER EIN NETZWERK VERTEILT SIND | [2003/27] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PROTECTING OBJECTS DISTRIBUTED OVER A NETWORK | [2003/27] | French: | SYSTEME SERVANT A PROTEGER DES OBJETS DISTRIBUES SUR UN RESEAU | [2003/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2003 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 04.04.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5276735 (BOEBERT WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [Y]US5563946 (COOPER THOMAS E [US], et al) |